OK HB1689 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Telemedicine; definitions; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telemedicine; definitions; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2021-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2021-03-04Senatecoauthored by Bell
2021-03-04SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-03HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-03HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2021-03-03HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-24HouseAuthored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
2021-02-24HouseCR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Newton
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1689&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB1689%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB1689%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB1689%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB1689%20SFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB1689%20(4-19-21)%20(MCCORTNEY)%20FS%20FA1.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1689%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB1689%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1689_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1689_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments 750

feedback