OK HB1684 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred for enrollment
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and punishments; arrest and prosecute persons for certain gambling offenses; modifying duties of law enforcement; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and punishments; arrest and prosecute persons for certain gambling offenses; modifying duties of law enforcement; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Judiciary-Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseReferred for enrollment
2021-04-15SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-15SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
2021-04-15SenateMotion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4
2021-04-12SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Coleman
2021-04-12SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 15 Nays: 30
2021-04-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-03-29SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2021-03-17SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2021-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 16
2021-03-09HouseAuthored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
2021-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-24HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Judiciary - Criminal
2021-02-22HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Grego
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1684&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB1684%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1684%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB1684%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB1684%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB1684%20SFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1684%20FULLPCS1%20JIM%20GREGO-GRS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1684%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1684%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB1684%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1684_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1684_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback