OK HB1684 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1684

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; four-day school week; requiring school districts to submit plan to State Board of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; four-day school week; requiring school districts to submit plan to State Board of Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 60 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 21 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday
2017-05-15HouseCCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
2017-05-08SenateConference granted, SCs named Fields, Stanislawski, Daniels, Brecheen, Pemberton, Pittman, Dossett
2017-05-01HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Common Education
2017-04-20HouseSA's received
2017-04-20SenateEngrossed to House
2017-04-19SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-04-19SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 13
2017-04-19SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-04-10SenateEmergency clause stricken
2017-04-10SenateTitle stricken
2017-04-10SenateEmergency added
2017-04-10SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
2017-04-10SenateCoauthored by Senator Loveless
2017-03-27SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2017-03-22SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-22HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 38
2017-03-21HouseMotion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 60 Nays: 27
2017-03-14HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Wright
2017-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 43
2017-03-14HouseMotion to suspend rule failed
2017-03-14HouseAuthored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author)
2017-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Wright
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1684 (Carry Over) 2017-05-15 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
701111New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1684&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB1684%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1684%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB1684%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1684%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1684%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB1684%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB1684%20SFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB1684_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB1684_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback