OK HB1682 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; agricultural exemptions; federal income tax information; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; agricultural exemptions; federal income tax information; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateReferred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-03-25SenateWithdrawn from Finance committee
2021-03-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Burns
2021-03-17SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2021-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 5
2021-03-09HouseTitle stricken
2021-03-09HouseAmended
2021-03-09HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Bullard
2021-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-23HouseAuthored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)
2021-02-23HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hardin (David)
2021-02-23HouseCR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Grego
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback