OK HB1682 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1682
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Aircraft and airports; aircraft registration fees; modifying fees.
Title
Aircraft and airports; aircraft registration fees; modifying fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-06 | House | Motion expired |
2017-03-01 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Wright |
2017-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 24; Ayes: 61 Nays: 30 |
2017-03-01 | House | General Order |
2017-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Wright |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1682 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations