OK HB1676 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public safety; requiring Department of Public Safety to make certain forms available;
Title
Public safety; requiring Department of Public Safety to make certain forms available;
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Rep. Marian Cooksey [R] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Sen. Jonathan Nichols [R] |
Rep. Paul Roan [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House: (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House: (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/25/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-19 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-18 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-18 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2011-05-17 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2011-05-16 | To Senate | |
2011-05-16 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 4; Ayes: 59 Nays: 30 | |
2011-05-16 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2011-05-13 | Title restored | |
2011-05-13 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2011-05-03 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2011-05-02 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA | |
2011-04-26 | SA's received | |
2011-04-26 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-25 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-07 | coauthored by Ivester | |
2011-04-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-30 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0; Ayes: 87 Nays: 7 | |
2011-03-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan, Cooksey | |
2011-03-17 | General Order | |
2011-03-03 | Authored by Senator Nichols (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Billy | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27A | 2 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 10 | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 11 | 1112 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 156 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 122 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 143 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 144 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 40 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 752 | New Code | See Bill Text |