OK HB1675 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Railroads; fences; definition; effective date.
Title
Railroads; fences; definition; effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-02-04 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Kouplen |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |