OK HB1667 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1667
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Vetoed 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Vetoed 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; requiring assessments to be reviewed based on certain alignment during certain time period; effective date.
Title
Schools; requiring assessments to be reviewed based on certain alignment during certain time period; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Vetoed 05/10/2017 |
2017-05-04 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-04 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 2 |
2017-05-03 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 6 |
2017-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-14 | House | General Order |
2017-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Thomsen |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1667 (Carry Over) 2017-05-10 - Vetoed 05/10/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 11 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 508 | New Code | See Bill Text |