OK HB1660 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1660
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Daylight saving time; exempting Oklahoma from the federal daylight saving time provision; effective date.
Title
Daylight saving time; exempting Oklahoma from the federal daylight saving time provision; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin West [R] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] | Rep. Mickey Dollens [D] | Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] |
Rep. Thomas Marti [R] | Rep. Nicole Miller [R] | Rep. Randy Randleman [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] |
Rep. John Talley [R] | Rep. Anthony Moore [R] | Rep. Wendi Stearman [R] | Rep. Daniel Pae [R] |
Rep. Mark Lepak [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - House: States Rights Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore, Kerbs, Stearman, Smith, Marti, Dollens, Randleman, Talley, Miller |
2021-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass States Rights Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to States Rights |
2021-02-08 | House | Withdrawn from General Government Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1660 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)