OK HB1658 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; deleting certain testing improvement component used to calculate school grades.
Title
Schools; deleting certain testing improvement component used to calculate school grades.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 48 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 55 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 55 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Approved by Governor 05/24/2013 |
2013-05-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-16 | House | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 36; Ayes: 48 Nays: 30 |
2013-05-16 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2013-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 12 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 13 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2013-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 4 |
2013-03-05 | House | Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | General Order |
2013-02-12 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Denney |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |