OK HB1655 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Poor persons; coverage for prosthetic and orthotic devices; effective date.
Title
Poor persons; coverage for prosthetic and orthotic devices; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Rep. John Enns [R] | Sen. Rob Johnson [R] | Rep. Seneca Scott [D] |
Rep. Mike Shelton [D] | Rep. Purcy Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - House: Conference Committee on Health: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - House: Conference Committee on Health: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/25/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-19 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-18 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-18 | coauthored by Dorman | |
2011-05-18 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2011-05-17 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2011-05-17 | To Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Scott | |
2011-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-13 | Title restored | |
2011-05-13 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-03 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2011-05-02 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Health and Human Services | |
2011-04-26 | SA's received | |
2011-04-26 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-07 | coauthored by Shelton, Walker | |
2011-04-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-30 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 | |
2011-03-14 | General Order | |
2011-03-02 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-02 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Enns | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |