OK HB1652 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; deleting technology center schools from list of prohibited places; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; deleting technology center schools from list of prohibited places; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Rep. David Derby [R] | Rep. John Enns [R] |
Rep. George Faught [R] | Rep. Corey Holland [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Charles Key [R] |
Rep. Dan Kirby [R] | Rep. Jason Murphey [R] | Rep. Tom Newell [R] | Rep. Mike Reynolds [R] |
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Wade Rousselot [D] | Sen. Steve Russell [R] |
Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] | Rep. John Trebilcock [R] | Rep. Paul Wesselhoft [R] |
Rep. Harold Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: (Y: 75 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 0 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 51) [FAIL]
2011-05-10 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Suspend Rule (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: (Y: 75 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 0 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 51) [FAIL]
2011-05-10 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Suspend Rule (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/25/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-19 | Measure sent to House | |
2011-05-19 | Motion expired | |
2011-05-19 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Russell | |
2011-05-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 12 | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-17 | CCR read | |
2011-05-17 | To Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 5 | |
2011-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-12 | Title restored | |
2011-05-12 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-05 | Conference granted, SCs named Russell, Johnson (Rob), Sykes, Halligan, Ballenger, Eason McIntyre | |
2011-05-03 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2011-04-27 | SA's received | |
2011-04-27 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 6 | |
2011-04-26 | coauthored by Sykes | |
2011-04-26 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed | |
2011-04-06 | Referred to Rules | |
2011-04-06 | Withdrawn from Public Safety committee | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-03-14 | First Reading | |
2011-03-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 14 | |
2011-03-10 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught, Ritze, Rousselot, Newell, Reynolds, Roberts (Sean), Holland, Tibbs, Derby, Kirby, Trebilcock, Kern, Wright, Wesselhoft | |
2011-03-10 | General Order | |
2011-03-03 | Authored by Senator Russell (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey, Cockroft, Key, Bennett | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Enns | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1277 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 1280 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |