OK HB1630 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; Green Quality Jobs Act of 2011; incentive payments; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Green Quality Jobs Act of 2011; incentive payments; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Brown | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |