OK HB1629 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1629
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; directing courts and law enforcement agencies to protect certain rights of law-abiding citizens; codification; emergency.
Title
Firearms; directing courts and law enforcement agencies to protect certain rights of law-abiding citizens; codification; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Judiciary-Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Judiciary-Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Grego |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 19 |
2021-03-09 | House | Emergency added |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Stephens |
2021-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, West (Kevin), Bashore, Hill, Russ |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-02-10 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Sims, Kendrix |
2021-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Hardin (David) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1629 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety