OK HB1626 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1626
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tulsa Reconciliation Education and Scholarship Trust; administration of trust; organization; effective date; emergency.
Title
Tulsa Reconciliation Education and Scholarship Trust; administration of trust; organization; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Goodwin [D] | Sen. George Young [D] | Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] | Rep. John Waldron [D] |
Rep. Jared Deck [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Waldron |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 18 |
2024-03-13 | House | Amended |
2024-03-13 | House | House Rule suspended |
2024-03-13 | House | General Order |
2024-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Young (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Deck |
2024-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to General Government |
2024-02-15 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Goodwin |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1626 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee