OK HB1622 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Conference granted, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - Conference granted, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; relating to the School Testing Program Act; modifying testing.
Title
Schools; relating to the School Testing Program Act; modifying testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2016-02-24 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Common Education |
2015-05-06 | House | Rejection of SA's and request for conference rescinded |
2015-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Common Education |
2015-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-09 | Senate | coauthored by Bice |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | coauthored by Brecheen |
2015-03-30 | Senate | coauthored by Johnson |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | coauthored by Nollan |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Emergency not considered |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2015-03-11 | House | Amended |
2015-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Denney, Condit, Newell, Nelson, Cannaday, Caldwell, McCullough, Thomsen, Henke |
2015-03-11 | House | General Order |
2015-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Brumbaugh |
2015-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Derby |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 11 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 508 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 521 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 522 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 523 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 526 | New Code | See Bill Text |