OK HB1616 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1616
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; Oklahoma Medical Marijuana and Patient Protection Act; requiring disclosure of conflicts of interests from certain elected officials; effective date.
Title
Medical marijuana; Oklahoma Medical Marijuana and Patient Protection Act; requiring disclosure of conflicts of interests from certain elected officials; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 29 |
2023-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-08 | House | General Order |
2023-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Worthen |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1616 (Carry Over) 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce