OK HB1608 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Intoxicating liquors; definition of beneficial interest in package store; effective date.
Title
Intoxicating liquors; definition of beneficial interest in package store; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Bass [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 5 |
2015-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Bass (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin |
2015-03-05 | House | General Order |
2015-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Sherrer |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |