OK HB1607 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting adult cabaret near certain areas; rights-of-way maintenance; driving under the influence; directing law enforcement to provide certain notification; effective date.
Title
Prohibiting adult cabaret near certain areas; rights-of-way maintenance; driving under the influence; directing law enforcement to provide certain notification; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Bass [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 60 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 60 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 37 |
2015-03-11 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 60 Nays: 26 |
2015-03-11 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Virgin |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 48 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amended |
2015-03-11 | House | House Rule suspended |
2015-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Bass (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin |
2015-03-11 | House | General Order |
2015-02-23 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Sherrer |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 865 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 3 | 220 | New Code | See Bill Text |