OK HB1602 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1602
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; requiring school districts to adopt a grading policy; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; requiring school districts to adopt a grading policy; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Enns [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Rep. Chad Caldwell [R] | Rep. Rhonda Baker [R] |
Rep. Mickey Dollens [D] | Rep. Tammy West [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 19 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Motion expired |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Sharp |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 24 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Pittman |
2017-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2017-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 20 |
2017-03-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Baker, Caldwell, West (Tammy), Dollens |
2017-03-22 | House | General Order |
2017-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Sharp (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Enns |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1602 (Carry Over) 2017-04-25 - Motion expired