OK HB1598 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1598
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Vetoed 04/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Vetoed 04/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Students; vision screening; authorizing the State Department of Education to approve vision screeners to conduct certain screenings; effective date; emergency.
Title
Students; vision screening; authorizing the State Department of Education to approve vision screeners to conduct certain screenings; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Melissa Provenzano [D] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Rep. John Waldron [D] |
Sen. Carri Hicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Vetoed 04/21/2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on General Order |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hicks |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education committee |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2021-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-03 | House | General Order |
2021-02-25 | House | Emergency added |
2021-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak, Waldron |
2021-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Common Education |
2021-02-09 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Provenzano |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1598 (Carry Over) 2021-04-21 - Vetoed 04/21/2021