OK HB1597 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; assault and battery upon police officers; expanding scope; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; assault and battery upon police officers; expanding scope; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 57 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Laid over | |
2012-03-13 | Considered | |
2012-03-13 | Laid over | |
2012-03-13 | General Order | |
2012-02-28 | Authored by Senator Shortey (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-28 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Martin (Steve) | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |