OK HB1588 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1588
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption for forestry equipment; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption for forestry equipment; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddy Dempsey [R] | Rep. Ty Burns [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] |
Rep. Jim Grego [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 23 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance-Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 23 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance-Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Approved by Governor 04/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-14 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Bullard; authored by Senator Burns |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 12 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2021-04-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 7 |
2021-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Grego |
2021-03-10 | House | General Order |
2021-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride |
2021-03-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules |
2021-03-03 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Dempsey, Roberts (Dustin) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1588 (Carry Over) 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2021