OK HB1577 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Landlord and tenant; modifying time limit for landlord to return security deposit; effective date.
Title
Landlord and tenant; modifying time limit for landlord to return security deposit; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Approved by Governor 04/20/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-14 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2 |
2015-03-02 | House | General Order |
2015-02-12 | House | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Commerce, and Real Estate |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Williams |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |