OK HB1576 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Cities and towns; modifying collective bargaining procedure; effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; modifying collective bargaining procedure; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. David Holt [R] | Rep. Scott Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-02-16 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Motion expired | |
2011-03-16 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Martin (Scott) | |
2011-03-16 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 53 | |
2011-03-16 | General Order | |
2011-02-17 | Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-17 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Martin (Scott) | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |