OK HB1567 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1567
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; controlled dangerous substances; deeming certain unlawful act as aggravated trafficking; providing separate penalty provision for aggravated trafficking of fentanyl; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; controlled dangerous substances; deeming certain unlawful act as aggravated trafficking; providing separate penalty provision for aggravated trafficking of fentanyl; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Judiciary-Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Judiciary-Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/03/2021 |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-28 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-27 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 15 |
2021-04-27 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2021-04-19 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Motion expired |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Weaver |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 12 |
2021-03-01 | House | General Order |
2021-02-10 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Boatman |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1567 (Carry Over) 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021