OK HB1566 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1566
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; sales tax; use of taxes collected from certain sales; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; sales tax; use of taxes collected from certain sales; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Approved by Governor 05/04/2021 |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-28 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-27 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 12 |
2021-04-27 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2021-04-14 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 17 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 12 |
2021-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Trey), Waldron |
2021-03-08 | House | General Order |
2021-02-18 | House | Title stricken |
2021-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Sims |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1566 (Carry Over) 2021-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2021