OK HB1566 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; sales tax; use of taxes collected from certain sales; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; sales tax; use of taxes collected from certain sales; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseApproved by Governor 05/04/2021
2021-04-28HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-28SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-28HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2021-04-27HouseReferred for enrollment
2021-04-27HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 12
2021-04-27HouseSA's read, adopted
2021-04-14HouseSA's received
2021-04-14SenateEngrossed to House
2021-04-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-04-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 17
2021-04-13SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-03-31SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2021-03-23SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-03-23SenateTitle restored
2021-03-23SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2021-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-09HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-08HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-08HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 12
2021-03-08HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Trey), Waldron
2021-03-08HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-18HouseTitle stricken
2021-02-18HouseAuthored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
2021-02-18HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2021-02-17HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee Committee
2021-02-03HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Sims
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1566&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB1566%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB1566%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB1566%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB1566%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1566%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB1566%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB1566%20CA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB1566%20CA2.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1566%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB1566%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1566%20SAHB%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1566_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1566_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback