OK HB1562 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1562

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

State Capital and Capitol Building; control of space by the Legislature; clarifying language; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Capital and Capitol Building; control of space by the Legislature; clarifying language; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24HouseLaid over
2017-05-24HouseConsidered
2017-05-23HouseTitle restored
2017-05-23HouseCCR submitted
2017-05-09SenateConference granted, SCs named Treat, Fields, Bice, Marlatt, Simpson, Sparks, Matthews
2017-05-03HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules
2017-05-01HouseSA's received
2017-05-01SenateEngrossed to House
2017-04-27SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-04-27SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2017-04-27SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-04-12SenateTitle stricken
2017-04-12SenateReported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-15HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-02-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-02-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2017-02-14HouseAuthored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
2017-02-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Ritze
2017-02-14HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-09HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Echols
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1562 (Carry Over) 2017-05-24 - Laid over

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73151New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback