OK HB1556 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1556
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Corporation Commission; prescribing Corporation Commission Director of Administration certain duties; effective date.
Title
Corporation Commission; prescribing Corporation Commission Director of Administration certain duties; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 26 |
2020-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-10 | House | Amended |
2020-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Remove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Taylor |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1556 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - Second Reading referred to Rules