OK HB1551 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1551
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; directing State Board of Examiners for Long-Term Care Administrators to present certain language relating to nursing facility administrators; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; directing State Board of Examiners for Long-Term Care Administrators to present certain language relating to nursing facility administrators; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 11 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 35 |
2017-03-20 | House | Amended |
2017-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-20 | House | General Order |
2017-02-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Faught |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1551 (Carry Over) 2017-04-26 - SA's received