OK HB1550 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; providing for retention of certain third-grade students; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; providing for retention of certain third-grade students; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Sen. John Ford [R] | Sen. David Holt [R] |
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 61 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 61 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | SA's received | |
2011-04-26 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-25 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 15 | |
2011-04-25 | coauthored by Ford | |
2011-04-25 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2011-04-05 | coauthored by Holt, David | |
2011-04-05 | Emergency added | |
2011-04-05 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-17 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Motion expired | |
2011-03-14 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Kern | |
2011-03-14 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 26; Ayes: 61 Nays: 27 | |
2011-03-14 | Amended | |
2011-03-14 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cockroft | |
2011-03-14 | General Order | |
2011-02-23 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nelson | |
2011-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Kern | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1210 | 508C | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 508D | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 508E | New Code | See Bill Text |