OK HB1548 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; judicial review; authorizing courts to review and modify sentences under certain circumstances; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; judicial review; authorizing courts to review and modify sentences under certain circumstances; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Sen. Casey Murdock [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Murdock, Sherrer, Hoskin |
2015-03-05 | House | General Order |
2015-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hickman |
2015-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2015-02-18 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Biggs |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |