OK HB1546 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1546
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Design professional services agreements; declaring certain provisions void and unenforceable; exceptions; applicability; effective date.
Title
Design professional services agreements; declaring certain provisions void and unenforceable; exceptions; applicability; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 11 |
2020-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-02-20 | House | Remove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Martinez |
2020-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2020-02-12 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1546 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - Second Reading referred to Rules