OK HB1538 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1538
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; HIV and AIDS education in schools; effective date.
Title
Schools; HIV and AIDS education in schools; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Motion expired |
2017-03-22 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Virgin |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 47 |
2017-03-22 | House | Amended |
2017-03-22 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-03-22 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-22 | House | Amended |
2017-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-22 | House | General Order |
2017-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dunnington |
2017-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Virgin |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1538 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Motion expired