OK HB1520 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; modifying penalties for certain uninsured motorist violation; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; modifying penalties for certain uninsured motorist violation; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Gus Blackwell [R] | Rep. Mike Brown [D] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] |
Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] | Rep. Mike Reynolds [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Rep. Mike Shelton [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - House - House: (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-04 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-04 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-03 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-03 | Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 13 | |
2011-05-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught | |
2011-05-03 | SA's read, adopted | |
2011-04-11 | SA's received | |
2011-04-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-07 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 | |
2011-04-07 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2011-04-07 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-03-31 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 23 | |
2011-03-14 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cockroft, Shelton | |
2011-03-14 | General Order | |
2011-02-24 | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-24 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Reynolds, Ritze | |
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Nollan, Blackwell | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |