OK HB1515 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1515

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; biennial registration; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; biennial registration; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseDied in conference
2017-05-09SenateConference granted, GCCA
2017-05-03HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
2017-04-26HouseSA's received
2017-04-26SenateEngrossed to House
2017-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 18
2017-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-04-12SenateEnacting clause stricken
2017-04-12SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-04-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Kidd
2017-04-11SenateRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee
2017-03-29SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Finance
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2017-03-23SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-23HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-22HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 17
2017-03-22HouseAmended
2017-03-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Condit, Roberts (Dustin)
2017-03-22HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-28HouseTitle stricken
2017-02-28HouseAuthored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author)
2017-02-28HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Sanders
2017-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2017-02-13HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2017-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Cockroft
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1515 (Carry Over) 2017-05-26 - Died in conference

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1515&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB1515%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1515%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB1515%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1515%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB1515%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB1515%20SFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB1515_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB1515_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback