OK HB1515 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-10)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-10)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; prohibiting health benefit plan from holding certain therapy to a higher standard of clinical evidence for benefit coverage decisions than other therapies; effective date.
Title
Insurance; prohibiting health benefit plan from holding certain therapy to a higher standard of clinical evidence for benefit coverage decisions than other therapies; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Approved by Governor 04/17/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-14 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-04-06 | Senate | coauthored by Schulz |
2015-03-26 | Senate | coauthored by Boggs, Bass, Sparks, Stanislawski |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Insurance committee; CR filed |
2015-03-25 | Senate | coauthored by Simpson |
2015-03-24 | Senate | coauthored by Quinn |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2015-03-16 | Senate | coauthored by Holt |
2015-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Christian |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Randy), Perryman, Hoskin, Sherrer, Roberts (Sean), Shelton, Virgin |
2015-03-11 | House | General Order |
2015-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Sharp (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Coody (Ann), Derby, Moore, McDaniel (Jeannie), Morrissette |
2015-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Cooksey, Billy, Denney, Kern, Osborn, Nelson |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |