OK HB1514 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; modifying certain hearing requirements; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; modifying certain hearing requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Authored by Senator Boggs (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-23 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-02-05 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Murdock |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 20 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 20 | 46 | New Code | See Bill Text |