OK HB1508 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Civil procedure; payments to minors; Internal Revenue Code; Section 529; College Savings Accounts; effective date.
Title
Civil procedure; payments to minors; Internal Revenue Code; Section 529; College Savings Accounts; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Died in conference |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Sparks, Sykes, Griffin, Jolley, Crain, Floyd, Brooks |
2015-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 3 |
2015-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin |
2015-03-11 | House | General Order |
2015-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Virgin |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |