OK HB1499 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1499
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Coauthored by Senator Dugger
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Coauthored by Senator Dugger
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; transferring aircraft assets, operations and standards of the Bureau of Narcotics and Dangerous Control and State Bureau of Investigation to the Department of Public Safety; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; transferring aircraft assets, operations and standards of the Bureau of Narcotics and Dangerous Control and State Bureau of Investigation to the Department of Public Safety; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Babinec [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] | Sen. Tom Dugger [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dugger |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Dugger; authored by Senator Murdock |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 5 |
2017-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, West (Josh) |
2017-03-01 | House | General Order |
2017-02-16 | House | Authored by Senator Dugger (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Babinec |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1499 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 2 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 106 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 150 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 500 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 12b | New Code | See Bill Text |