OK HB1486 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Vetoed 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Vetoed 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Woody biomass; creating the Oklahoma Woody Biomass Energy Initiative Act of 2011; creating the Woody Biomass Energy Initiative Council; emergency.
Title
Woody biomass; creating the Oklahoma Woody Biomass Energy Initiative Act of 2011; creating the Woody Biomass Energy Initiative Council; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 34 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2011-05-20 - House - House: SENATE AMEND (Y: 74 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: : (Y: 34 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2011-05-20 - House - House: SENATE AMEND (Y: 74 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: : (Y: 34 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Vetoed 05/26/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-20 | Motion expired | |
2011-05-20 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Brown | |
2011-05-20 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 15; Ayes: 34 Nays: 56 | |
2011-05-20 | Ayes: 74 Nays: 5 | |
2011-05-20 | SA's read, adopted | |
2011-04-25 | SA's received | |
2011-04-25 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-20 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-20 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2011-03-10 | First Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 20 | |
2011-03-09 | General Order | |
2011-02-23 | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Morrissette | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 18 | 409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |