OK HB1474 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Failed in Committee - Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Failed in Committee - Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; voluntary out benefits; allowing certain employees to receive more than one voluntary out benefit; effective date.
Title
State government; voluntary out benefits; allowing certain employees to receive more than one voluntary out benefit; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: State Government Operations Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: State Government Operations Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Appropriations |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Shortey (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-11 | House | General Order |
2015-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute State Government Operations Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to State Government Operations |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Wood |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |