OK HB1474 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Wildlife Conservation Code; increasing maximum fine amount for trespass; effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Wildlife Conservation Code; increasing maximum fine amount for trespass; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. John Sparks [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor 04/26/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-19 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2 | |
2011-04-19 | coauthored by Sparks | |
2011-04-19 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 9 | |
2011-03-08 | General Order | |
2011-02-23 | Removed from Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | Placed on Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Armes | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |