OK HB1470 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1470

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Civil procedure; deleting time limitations for civil actions based on childhood sexual abuse incidents; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil procedure; deleting time limitations for civil actions based on childhood sexual abuse incidents; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10HouseApproved by Governor 05/10/2017
2017-05-04HouseSent to Governor
2017-05-04SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-05-04HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-05-03HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-05-03HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2
2017-05-03HouseSA's read, adopted
2017-04-25HouseSA's received
2017-04-25SenateEngrossed to House
2017-04-24SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-04-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2017-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Loveless
2017-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2017-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-04-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Daniels
2017-04-11SenateReported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2017-03-27SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2017-03-21SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2017-03-20HouseAmended
2017-03-20HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Osborn (Leslie), West (Josh), Derby
2017-03-20HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-21HouseAuthored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author)
2017-02-21HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Bush
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1470 (Carry Over) 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1470&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB1470%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1470%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB1470%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1470%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB1470%20ENR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB1470%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB1470%20HFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB1470_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB1470_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback