OK HB1470 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1470
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Civil procedure; deleting time limitations for civil actions based on childhood sexual abuse incidents; effective date.
Title
Civil procedure; deleting time limitations for civil actions based on childhood sexual abuse incidents; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Sen. David Holt [R] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Rep. Dale Derby [R] |
Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] | Sen. Kyle Loveless [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Sen. Julie Daniels [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Approved by Governor 05/10/2017 |
2017-05-04 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-04 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2 |
2017-05-03 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Loveless |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Daniels |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | Amended |
2017-03-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Osborn (Leslie), West (Josh), Derby |
2017-03-20 | House | General Order |
2017-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Bush |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1470 (Carry Over) 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017