OK HB1468 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1468

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal procedure; creating the Hidden Predator Act; modifying time limitations for prosecuting certain sexual offenses; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; creating the Hidden Predator Act; modifying time limitations for prosecuting certain sexual offenses; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01HouseApproved by Governor 05/01/2017
2017-04-25HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-25SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-04-25HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-04-24HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-04-24SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2017-04-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2017-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-04-24SenateCoauthored by Senator Loveless
2017-04-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Daniels
2017-04-11Senatecoauthored by Biggs
2017-04-11SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2017-03-27SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2017-03-21Senatecoauthored by Goodwin
2017-03-21SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2017-03-20HouseAmended
2017-03-20HouseHouse Rule suspended
2017-03-20HouseAmended
2017-03-20HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Loring, West (Josh), Osborn (Leslie), Derby
2017-03-20HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-16HouseAuthored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author)
2017-02-16HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
2017-02-16HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Bush
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1468 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback