OK HB1461 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB1461

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-03 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Conservation; Conservation Commission; Woody Invasion Cost Share Program; purpose; funds; guidelines; research; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conservation; Conservation Commission; Woody Invasion Cost Share Program; purpose; funds; guidelines; research; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-03SenateReferred to Appropriations
2023-04-03SenateEnacting clause stricken
2023-04-03SenateReported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed
2023-03-29SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2023-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3
2023-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2023-03-02HouseTitle stricken
2023-03-02HouseAuthored by Senator Pederson (principal Senate author)
2023-03-02HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2023-02-16HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget
2023-02-16HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Patzkowsky
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1461 (Carry Over) 2023-04-03 - Referred to Appropriations

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1461&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB1461%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1461%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB1461%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB1461%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1461%20FULLPCS1%20KENTON%20PATZKOWSKY-JL.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1461%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1461%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/HB1461%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1461_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1461_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback