OK HB1461 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1461
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; city and county jail inspections; deleting and replacing references; authorizing inspectors to share jail inspections with other offices when deemed appropriate; effective date.
Title
State government; city and county jail inspections; deleting and replacing references; authorizing inspectors to share jail inspections with other offices when deemed appropriate; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 04/24/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 2 |
2018-03-12 | House | Remove Senator Treat as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Rosino |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-05 | House | Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Babinec |
2018-03-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Withdrawn from Calendar; referred to General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1461 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee