OK HB1456 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; modifying owner consent required for annexation under specified conditions; effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; modifying owner consent required for annexation under specified conditions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 4 |
2015-03-04 | House | General Order |
2015-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Murdock, Pfeiffer |
2015-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Leewright |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |